Neufeld, Mark Victor (CPSO#: 66783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2000


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 112
450 Speedvale Avenue West
Guelph ON  N1H 7Y6
Phone: (519) 822-5501
Fax: (519) 836-0783
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark V. Neufeld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2006

Dr. M. Neufeld ( CPSO# 66783 )

Business Address:
Suite 112
450 Speedvale Avenue West
Guelph ON  N1H 7Y6
Phone Number: (519) 822-5501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph


Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MARK VICTOR NEUFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUFELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2000