Neuhaus, Diego Theodor Hans Paul (CPSO#: 107366)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 18, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On November 18, 2016, the Hospital for Sick Children, Toronto, notified the College that Dr. Diego Neuhaus has agreed to not exercise his privileges at the Hospital for Sick Children.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Anaesthesia

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Anaesthesia

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017