Neville, Jeffrey Scott (CPSO#: 63791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brookdale Family Clinic
304 Bellevue Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 5G1
Phone: (705) 743-7100
Fax: (705) 743-7104
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Student Health Service
Trent University
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B8
Canada
Phone: (705) 748-1481
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Sobiera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Neville ( CPSO# 63791 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C5
Phone Number: (705) 876-5022

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY SCOTT NEVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEVILLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1992