Newall, John Ross (CPSO#: 19591)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John R. Newall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 26 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017