Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Newbery, Sarah-Lynn (CPSO#: 66686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone: (807) 229-3243
Fax: (807) 229-2672
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Orrantia and Newbery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Orrantia ( CPSO# 66558 )
Dr. S. Newbery ( CPSO# 66686 )

Business Address:
Marathon Family Health Team
Box 399
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone Number: (807) 229-3243

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH-LYNN NEWBERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWBERY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 1995 to 28 Feb 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 1996 to 31 May 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995