Newbigging, Joseph Lorne (CPSO#: 70067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1998


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2368
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Newbigging Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2009

Dr. J. Newbigging ( CPSO# 70067 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Empire 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. JOSEPH LORNE NEWBIGGING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWBIGGING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1998