Newbigin, Brian (CPSO#: 21496)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2004