Neweduk, Peter Michael (CPSO#: 61383)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006