Newell, Kenneth James (CPSO#: 70261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
Department Of Pathology
1800 8th Street East
P O Box 1800
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2560
Fax: (519) 378-1539
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. J. Newell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Newell ( CPSO# 70261 )

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH JAMES NEWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001