Newell, Michael Robert (CPSO#: 62644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6401 Ext. 6304
Fax: (519) 436-2536
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael R. Newell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Newell ( CPSO# 62644 )

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ROBERT NEWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1991