Newkirk, Lynda Kathleen (CPSO#: 74706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Inpatient Medical Services Rm G162
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35543
Fax: (905) 381-5634
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNDA KATHLEEN NEWKIRK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWKIRK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002