Newman, Adam Isaiah Sebastian Shun (CPSO#: 63511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Ontario Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2Y4
Phone: (613) 544-9121
Fax: (613) 544-9793
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart St.
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 2423
Fax: (613) 548-2329
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Newman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Newman ( CPSO# 63511 )

Business Address:
130 Ontario Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2Y4
Phone Number: (613) 544-9121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM ISAIAH SEBASTIAN SHUN NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)