Newman, Alice Anne (CPSO#: 62359)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICE ANNE NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 20 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991