Newman, Alvin (CPSO#: 26232)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Pittsburgh, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: 647-933-2904 www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 13 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 9, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)