Newman, Christine Jean (CPSO#: 52075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-6342
Fax: 416-813-7999
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE JEAN NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1989