Newman, David Marc (CPSO#: 51271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Dalhousie University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 215
6633 Highway #7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 472-7127
Fax: (905) 472-6534
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 330
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-5996
Fax: (416) 461-6479
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Unit 11-14
398 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X3
Canada
Phone: (905) 881-0334
Fax: (905) 881-1721
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Newman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Newman ( CPSO# 51271 )

Business Address:
6633 Highway #7 East
Suite 215
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 472-7127

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MARC NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1985