Newman, John Douglas (CPSO#: 17956)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 14 Mar 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1961
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Apr 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009