Newman, Stephen Carl (CPSO#: 51272)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Apr 2002