Newnham, Darlene Jean (CPSO#: 66649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C F B Borden
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone: (705) 424-1200 Ext. 1817
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Laser Health Works
93 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 5G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 739-0721
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

1802 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5M 3Z1
Canada
Phone: (416) 787-6333
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARLENE JEAN NEWNHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWNHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995