Newton, Barbara Louise (CPSO#: 68131)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 27 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2008