Newton, Frederick Marcus (CPSO#: 68850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey-Bruce Regional Health Services
Room 5101
1800 - 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4H 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-4888
Fax: (519) 376-0024
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK MARCUS NEWTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2000