Newton, Peter Timothy (CPSO#: 59503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58226
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Newton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Newton ( CPSO# 59503 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesia
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6C 6B5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER TIMOTHY NEWTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1993