Ng, David Chow Kong (CPSO#: 82853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 01 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 1, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Chow Kong Ng, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Ng has given to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                        DR. DAVID CHOW KONG NG
                                              ("Dr. Ng")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public; 
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ng, certificate of registration number 82853, am a member of the
                  College. I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with respect to
                  my knowledge, skill and judgment. I am aware of the College's concern
                  about protecting the public. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Ng, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").

            (4)   I, Dr. Ng, undertake that I will not practise medicine in any
                  jurisdiction until each and every one of the following conditions have
                  been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine;
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and 
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Ng, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward
                  a request to the General Manager of the OHIP that my billing number be
                  deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and
                  before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in
                  accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (6)   I, Dr. Ng, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (7)   I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practise, the College may, among other things: 

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, conditions or limitations
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
                  this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (12)  I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 


            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
                        posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following
                        summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                        period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Ng's
                              knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Ng has
                              voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions
                              and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical
                              advice or services. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Ng, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate
                  enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have
                  relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Chow Kong Ng to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 1, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Ng’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Ng has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.