Ng, Derek Andrew (CPSO#: 68800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Near North Medical Clinic
Suite 201
66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone: (705) 495-2685
Fax: (705) 495-4128
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

St Joseph's Mother House
2025 Main St W
North Bay ON  P1B 2X6
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-3800
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Eastholme Home for the Aged
62 Big Bend Road
Powassan ON  P0H 1Z0
Canada
Phone: (705) 724-2005
Fax: (705) 724-5429
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Andrew Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ng ( CPSO# 68800 )

Business Address:
201 - 66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone Number: (705) 495-2685

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK ANDREW NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997