Ng, Dominic Sun-Kuen (CPSO#: 59719)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Room 3-041 Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5197
Fax: (416) 864-5584
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 101
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (416) 628-4020 Ext. 343
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMINIC SUN-KUEN NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989