Ng, Eugene Hing-Lun (CPSO#: 70745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M4-230a
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 87781
Fax: (416) 480-5612
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Paediatrics
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6305
Fax: (416) 756-6817
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eugene Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 70745 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4-230a
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENE HING-LUN NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2000