Ng, Herman Yip-Chi (CPSO#: 30288)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Feb 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Kaohsiung Medical College, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Herman Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1978
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 11 Sep 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Feb 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Feb 2016
Summary:

On February 22, 2016, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Herman Yip-Chi Ng committed 
an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession; and that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. The Discipline Committee also found that Dr. Ng is 
incompetent. 
 
Patient A was Dr. Ng’s patient for approximately ten years. On February 13, 2015, the College 
received a Complaint Form from Patient A expressing concerns about how Dr. Ng conducted 
himself during an appointment on February 7, 2015. Patient A was also concerned that Dr. Ng 
failed to maintain adequate cleanliness in his office environment.  
 
On February 27, 2015, the College conducted an unannounced inspection at Dr. Ng’s clinic 
which revealed significant cleanliness concerns, including: 
   -  the disposing of used non-safety engineered syringes in a dirty sink;  
   -  no clear delineation between soiled and clean areas;  
   -  improper cleansing and disinfecting of instruments; and  
   -  a dirty and cluttered examination/utility/consultation room.  
 
On April 15, 2015, Dr. Ng provided the College with what he purported to be Patient A’s 
original patient chart. 
       
The College investigator sent a letter to Dr. Ng on dated May 11, 2015 asking for Dr. Ng to 
confirm that he had not altered the chart in any way or made any changes to it, and that all 
entries were made on the dates shown on the chart. 
 
Dr. Ng’s counsel sent a letter to the College on May 13, 2015 stating that Dr. Ng had not altered 
the chart in any way, and that all entries had been made contemporaneously.  
       
The College retained a forensic document examiner to review Patient A’s chart. The forensic 
report confirmed that parts of Dr. Ng’s chart for Patient A had been substituted and backdated. 
       
The College retained an expert, Dr. Z, to review Dr. Ng’s care for Patient A; Dr. Ng’s infection 
control procedures; and Dr. Ng’s maintenance of equipment in his practice.   
 
Dr. Z’s review of Dr. Ng’s care of Patient A was based on Dr. Ng’s chart, which had been 
altered by Dr. Ng. 
       
Dr. Z’s comments on Dr. Ng’s infection control procedures included the following: 
 
“Dr. Ng did not meet the standard of practice of the profession as of March 12, 2015 with respect 
to infection control procedures and maintenance of equipment in his practice. [His] care in 
relation to infection control as of March 12, 2015 displayed a lack of knowledge, care and 
judgment in that he was unaware of and/or did not implement basic office infection control 
processes and procedures that are readily available to all Ontario physicians through Public 
Health Ontario. In my opinion, his deficit is severe as the breaches in infection control were 
numerous and place patients at risk. Dr. Ng’s practice, behaviour, and conduct in relation to 
 
 
infection control as of March 12, 2015 exposed his patients to harm and was likely to expose his 
patients to injury. Significant risks resulting from his practice, behaviour and conduct include 
transmission of respiratory pathogens such as influenza, enteric pathogens such as C difficile and 
blood borne pathogens such as hepatitis B or C.” 
 
Dr. Ng wrote to the College on August 7, 2015 in response to the forensic document report as 
well as Dr. Z’s report. Dr. Ng maintained in his response that he had not altered Patient A’s 
chart, despite the forensic document report.  
 
SECTION 75(1)(A) INVESTIGATION 
 
Based on Patient A’s letter of complaint and the College’s unannounced inspection of Dr. Ng’s 
clinic on February 27, 2015, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports approved the appointment of 
investigators to conduct a broader investigation into Dr. Ng’s practice under section 75(a) of the 
Health Professions Procedural Code on March 10, 2015.   
 
On March 3, 2015, the College notified Toronto Public Health that Dr. Ng was using 
unacceptable infection prevention and control practices while providing patient care at his office.  
       
On March 6, 2015, an inspection by Toronto Public Health concluded that Dr. Ng failed to use 
adequate infection prevention and control practices. On the same day, Toronto Public Health 
gave a verbal order under section 13 of the Health Protection and Promotion Act, requiring Dr. 
Ng to close his office until further notice.   
       
On March 11, 2015, Toronto Public Health served a written order requiring Dr. Ng to make 
improvements to his office, including disposing sharps in an approved sharps container; ensuring 
the premises is clean and in good repair at all times; ensuring there is an area that has a sink for 
cleaning and disinfecting instruments; and ensuring that single-use items are discarded safely 
after use.  
 
On March 23, 2015, Toronto Public Health re-inspected Dr. Ng's practice and concluded that he 
made the necessary corrective infection prevention and control measures and reopened the 
premises for patient care.  
       
On July 2, 2015, the College conducted a re-inspection of Dr. Ng’s office which revealed 
continuing infection control issues.  
       
The College retained Dr. Z to review Dr. Ng’s standard of care. Based on an office inspection, an 
observation of Dr. Ng's practice, an interview with Dr. Ng, and a review of 26 patient charts as 
well as a review of five patient charts whose care she observed on June 8, 2015, Dr. Z stated that:   
 
   -  In 25 charts, Dr. Ng failed to properly maintain a CPP, medication record or 
      immunization record. 
   -  In  16 charts, Dr. Ng failed to meet the standard in assessing, documenting, investigating 
      and managing patients with a thyroid nodule, microcytic anemia, low hemoglobin/ 
      hematocrit, ulcer pain, infected heel wound, ongoing albuminuria, diabetes, toothache 
      and not referring patients for dental care, using non-evidence based treatments for 
 
 
      prostatitis, H-pyloris titers, zoster infections, carpal tunnel syndrome, enuresis in a 2 year 
      old child, in having performed a laryngoscopy on a patient, and not having used a growth 
      chart and not following the Ontario immunization schedule. 
   -  Dr. Ng failed to meet the standard of care in 5 out of 5 of the patients observed, including 
      performing blood pressure assessment, assessing a patient's complaint of fatigue and back 
      pain, following up on an abnormal HgA1C, assessing a patient's complaint of chest pain 
      and shortness of breath, managing a patient's oral pain. 
   -  Dr. Ng demonstrates a lack of knowledge/skill/judgment in the areas of pap screening, 
      use of glucometer, use of otoscope, H pylori screening, ordering diagnostic testings such 
      as mammography, pelvic ultrasound, thyroid ultrasound and abdominal ultrasound, office 
      emergency procedures, periodic screening, management of diabetes, chest pain 
      assessment, use of Rourke or developmental record and Ontario immunization schedule.  
   -  In 15 out of 23 charts, Dr. Ng's practice is likely to expose his patients to harm/injury. 
   -  In 5 out of 5 patients observed, Dr. Ng's practice may expose his patients to harm/injury.  
       
With respect to Dr. Ng's Infection Control Practice, Dr. Z opined as follows: 
   -  Dr. Ng carried out improper reprocessing multi-use equipment and displayed a lack of 
      knowledge of proper reprocessing process. 
   -  Once hygiene product was available in his office after the Toronto Public Health 
      investigation, he did not utilize it once during the patient observations on June 8, 2015; 
      he did not manage sharps appropriately; he did not document hepatitis B status properly; 
      he did not manage multi-dose vials properly; he did not have controls for refrigerated 
      items; he did not understand or carry out syndromic surveillance.  
 
      “Dr. Ng's clinical practice created a definite risk of harm for patients who attended his 
      office prior to February 27, 2015. The risk was one of transmission of respiratory, enteric 
      and bloodborne pathogens, and transmission of multi-drug resistant organisms such as 
      methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus (MRSA).The nature of the harm ranged from 
      possible acute infection to colonization with a risk of future infection. Depending on the 
      pathogen, infection could have caused significant morbidity and even mortality. It is not 
      possible to quantitate the probability of the harm…any patient may have been exposed to 
      harm.” 
 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Ng to appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Ng to pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00 
within 30 days of the date of this Order. 
 
On February 22, 2016, Dr. Ng resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or 
reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): February 22, 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Herman Yip-Chi Ng to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 22, 2016.

Dr. Ng resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)