Ng, Jonathan Michael (CPSO#: 86356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ng Rutherford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ng ( CPSO# 86356 )
Dr. K. Rutherford ( CPSO# 95346 )

Business Address:
Westend Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Apr 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN MICHAEL NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2012