Ng, Kuan Huei (CPSO#: 99804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Mar 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Malay, Mandarin

Education:University of London, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DBCVSRI
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521 2100 Ext. 40527
Fax: (905) 577-1427
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kuan Huei Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ng ( CPSO# 99804 )

Business Address:
DBCVSRI
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Suite C4-123
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 07 Mar 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Mar 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Jan 2013 to 15 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 16 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Kuan Huei Ng may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Neurology, McMaster University, in which Dr. Ng holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Ng   no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College receives a report indicating that  Dr.  Ng's  clinical
                        performance,  knowledge,  skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive  an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee makes a decision about Dr. Ng's certificate of
                        registration,  following  consideration  of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on March 7, 2014, and  expires  on  June  30,
                  2020.   Upon  renewal  of  Dr.  Ng's  academic  appointment  at  McMaster
                  University,  the  expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
                  in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.