Ng, Lung Kwan (CPSO#: 60248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DR Ng Lung Kwan Clinic
room 507 ,Hang Seng Bank Building
18 Carnarvon Road, kowloon
Hong Kong 852
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 27231116
Fax: -
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

-
H K 852
Hong Kong S A R
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 97702210
Fax: -
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 10 Aug 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 10 Aug 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 10, 2015, the following voluntary cease-to-practise Undertaking
            by Lung Kwan Ng is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the
            certificate of registration held by Dr. Ng:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                    DR. LUNG KWAN NG
                                          ("Dr. Ng")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Ng, certificate of registration number 60248, am a member of the
                  College. The College has inquired into my compliance with the requirement
                  to participate in a program of continuing professional development.    

            (2)   I, Dr. Ng, am currently not practicing medicine in Ontario.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Ng, undertake to the College that, effective immediately, I will
                  not practise medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the
                  following conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (4)   I, Dr. Ng, undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking I
                  shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health
                  Insurance Plan ("OHIP") that my billing number be deactivated for
                  services rendered after the date I cease to practise and before the date
                  the College agrees that I may return to practise in accordance with the
                  terms of this Undertaking. If I do not have an active Ontario Health
                  Insurance Plan ("OHIP") billing number, I undertake to provide proof of
                  same to the College.

            (5)   I, Dr. Ng, undertake to the College to abide by the terms of the
                  College's Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who
                  Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their
                  Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as
                  Appendix "A".  I also undertake to abide by the College's Policy on
                  Physicians Re-entering Practice, a copy of which is attached hereto as
                  Appendix "B". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (6)   I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge that in exchange for this Undertaking, the College
                  has agreed to take no further action in relation to my failure to
                  participate in a program of continuing professional development.

            (7)   I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge and agree that in considering my request to return
                  to practice, the Registrar may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Ng, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee or Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

            (10)  I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which
                  is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,
                  c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Ng, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate
                  enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                  information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the
                  terms of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Ng, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.