Ng, Matthew (CPSO#: 92911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Medical Centre
85 East Mall Suite 400
Etobicoke ON  M8Z5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ng ( CPSO# 92911 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke Medical Centre
400 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M9B 3Z9
Phone Number: (416) 621-2220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2013