Ng, Paul Sun-Ying (CPSO#: 23344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 245
Fax: (416) 279-0857
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul S.Y. Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ng ( CPSO# 23344 )

Business Address:
10 - 78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 279-0855

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL SUN-YING NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1970