Ng, Raymond Hin Wai (CPSO#: 59334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone: (416) 628-4020
Fax: (416) 628-4021
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raymond H. W. Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ng ( CPSO# 59334 )

Business Address:
101 - 7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 628-4020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND HIN WAI NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1990