Ng, Stephen Siu Lung (CPSO#: 58203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Runnymede Healthcare Centre
625 Runnymede Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3
Phone: (416) 762-7316
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ng ( CPSO# 58203 )

Business Address:
Runnymede Healthcare Centre
625 Runnymede Road
Toronto ON  M6S 3A3
Phone Number: (416) 486-3872

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Runnymede Healthcare Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN SIU LUNG NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1988