Ng, Steven Chin Yuen (CPSO#: 71050)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Leicester, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Apr 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 1998