Ng Tung Hing, Edward Kwet Khiong (CPSO#: 68129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit G
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone: (905) 836-6844
Fax: (905) 836-5158
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edward Ng Tung Hing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ng Tung Hing ( CPSO# 68129 )

Business Address:
Unit G
17215 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8E4
Phone Number: (905) 836-6844

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 12 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD KWET KHIONG NG TUNG HING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG TUNG HING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998