Ng, Victor Kar Ho (CPSO#: 91377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rough Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON M1D4B9
Toronto ON  M1E4B9
Phone: 416-284-8131
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victor Kar Ho Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ng ( CPSO# 91377 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Rough Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR KAR HO NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011