Ng, Victor Keng Wai (CPSO#: 84249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richmond Hill Medical and
After Hours Clinic
301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R2
Phone: (905) 709-4274
Fax: (905) 709-4985
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health One Medical Centre
5292 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 5P9
Canada
Phone: (416) 223-6666
Fax: (416) 223-5335
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Victor Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ng ( CPSO# 84249 )

Business Address:
Richmond Hill Medical and After Hours Clinic
301 High Tech Road
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R2
Phone Number: (905) 709-4274

Business Address:
Waterfront Medical Centre
266B Queens Quay West
Toronto ON  M5J 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 595-9699

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTOR KENG WAI NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008