Ng, Wai Pui (CPSO#: 62503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
A10 - 307
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3048
Fax: (519) 663-2987
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wai Pui Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Ng ( CPSO# 62503 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
A10 - 307
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAI PUI NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2000 to 01 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1991