Ngo, Susan (CPSO#: 95651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1383 16th Avenue Unit 1A
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E2
Phone: (905) 918-3560
Fax: 9056698646
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wang Ngo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ngo ( CPSO# 95651 )
Dr. X. Wang ( CPSO# 101060)

Business Address:
1383 18th Avenue
Suite 1A
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 918-3560

Business Address:
Unit 27
420 York Regional Road 7
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3K2
Phone Number: (905) 695-1133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN NGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 26 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2015