Nguan, Christopher Yee Chaung (CPSO#: 78905)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Elective Trainee - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006