Nguan, Oliver Yee Chih (CPSO#: 76026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON  K1V 2A4
Phone: (613) 739-3700
Fax: (613) 739-7043
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oliver Y.C. Nguan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Nguan ( CPSO# 76026 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
Suite 5
3635 Rivergate Way
Ottawa ON  K1V 2A4
Phone Number: (613) 739-5382

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLIVER YEE CHIH NGUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2003