Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nguyen, An-Huy (CPSO#: 68715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
2555 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 5J1
Phone: (647) 483-8885
Fax: 647) 483-8884
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4459A Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 2N7
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-8088
Fax: (416) 281-8081
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4218 Lawrence ave East
Scarborough ON  M1E 4X9
Canada
Phone: (647) 722-2370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. An-Huy Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nguyen ( CPSO# 68715 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
4218 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1E 4X9
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Business Address:
4459 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 2N7
Phone Number: (416) 281-8088

Business Address:
Suite 5
2555 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 5J1
Phone Number: (647) 483-8885

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AN-HUY NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1995