Nguyen, Augustin (CPSO#: 79450)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
745 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Phone: (519) 740-8400
Fax: (519) 740-8440
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 650-2777
Fax: (519) 650-5577
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Augustin Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nguyen ( CPSO# 79450 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6
Phone Number: (519) 740-8400

Business Address:
200 - 50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330


Corporation Name: Drs. Chan Flamand Kolyn Lee Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chan ( CPSO# 64970 )
Dr. F. Flamand ( CPSO# 62734 )
Dr. D. Kolyn ( CPSO# 59578 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 77748 )
Dr. A. Nguyen ( CPSO# 79450 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Business Address:
Suite 201
745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6

Business Address:
Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AUGUSTIN NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007