Nguyen, Can Dinh (CPSO#: 52463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 City Center Drive
Suite 420
Mississauga, Ontario
L5N 2B5
Mississauga ON  L5N 2B5
Phone: (905) 828-4482
Fax: (905) 828-5136
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. D. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 6 2014


Corporation Name: C. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nguyen ( CPSO# 52463 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Professional Building
Suite 406
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 828-4482

Business Address:
The Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200


Corporation Name: S. D. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nguyen ( CPSO# 52463 )
Dr. S. Nguyen ( CPSO# 100561)

Business Address:
24 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 527-1650

Business Address:
Creditview Medical
Room 14B
1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5V 1N3
Phone Number: (905) 567-4622

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAN DINH NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1984