Nguyen, Collin Thang (CPSO#: 103534)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ryerson Medical Centre
350 Victoria St, Room KHW-181
Toronto ON  M5G 2K3
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health & Wellness Medical Centre
University of Toronto
214 College Street, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-8030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Cannabinoid Medical Clinic
1 Eglinton Ave East, Suite 407
Toronto ON  M4P3A1
Canada
Phone: 18882827763
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLLIN THANG NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2016