Nguyen, Dao (CPSO#: 74158)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 1999 to 30 Aug 1999
Elective Trainee - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 1999