Nguyen, Don (CPSO#: 98666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anesthesia Associates
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DON NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017