Nguyen, Duc Truong (CPSO#: 52053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saigon, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837 6440 Ext. 2322
Fax: 519-837 6461
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Canada
Phone: (519) 824-1010 Ext. 2157
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Truong Duc Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nguyen ( CPSO# 52053 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6403

Business Address:
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 09 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUC TRUONG NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1988