Nguyen, Erika Thuy-Ha (CPSO#: 93873)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 04 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 10 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Anaesthesia

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 2016